MD HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain taxpayers who establish a child care center to provide child care services for the children of the taxpayer's employees or who compensate a child care provider or child care referral service for services provided to the taxpayers' employees; requiring the State Department of Education, on application of a taxpayer, to issue a tax credit certificate under certain circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Center and Employer-Provided Child Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Child Care
Education, State Department of
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Education, State Department of
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment