MD HB68 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a grantee who receives financial assistance of over $500,000 from the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Nonpoint Source Fund to demonstrate that specified steps were taken to include small businesses and specified minority business enterprises; requiring the Department to consider the availability to grantees of specified small businesses and certified minority business enterprises; and authorizing the Department of the Environment to withhold financial assistance for a project under specified circumstances.
Title
Department of the Environment - Grants - Small Businesses and Certified
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2009-10-05 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Minorities
Small Business
Women
Coastal Bays
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Minorities
Small Business
Women