MD HB679 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county board of education to extend the length of the school year for up to 5 school days beyond June 15 without approval from the State Board of Education; and requiring a county board to submit a written application to the State Board for permission to increase the length of the school year for more than a certain number of days in accordance with certain provisions of law or to decrease the length of the school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]
Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-12) (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {204032/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (125-12)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-07HouseFloor Amendment {243627/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected
2018-03-06HouseSpecial Order until 3/7 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {115060/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0679&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0679f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0679t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0679e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_35_hb0679e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0679_11506001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0679_24362701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0679_20403201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0679.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0679_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0293.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0679_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0986.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1094.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback