MD HB677 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that each member of the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County be a resident and voter of Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB38 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Residency
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |