MD HB677 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39
2018-03-20HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (132-4)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {316183/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback