MD HB674 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the uses of the Historic Preservation Loan Fund; and authorizing the Maryland Historic Trust to transfer funds from the Fund to a qualified cooperating nonprofit organization to pay for the acquisition, restoration, or rehabilitation of certain historic properties, to provide loans for the acquisition, rehabilitation, restoration, or refinancing of certain properties, and for necessary administrative and programmatic expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Historic Trust - Historic Preservation Loan Fund - Qualified Cooperating Nonprofit Organizations - Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204
2023-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2023-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2023-03-28SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2023-03-20SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2023-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {913126/1 Adopted
2023-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2023-02-09HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB425 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement5A327(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement5A331(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback