MD HB674 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the stay of certain eviction proceedings when a tenant is waiting for a determination on a good faith application for rental assistance.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (84-35) |
2022-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483421/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB384 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Evidence
Examinations
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Evidence
Examinations
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |