MD HB674 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a full survey within 3 months after the date of transfer of a licensed nursing home, and an unannounced, on-site follow-up survey within 120 days after the full survey was completed, if the ownership of the nursing home is transferred to a person that does not own or operate another nursing home in the State at the time of the transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160
2021-04-01HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {696488/1 Adopted
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-02HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB704 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General191408(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback