MD HB672 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence to provide grants for housing voucher funds to counties to house homeless veterans and survivors of domestic violence; authorizing the Governor in fiscal year 2020 to include funding in the annual budget for the Program; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to distribute grants to counties and establish grant application procedures; authorizing the Department to establish preferences for certain counties; etc.
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {120612/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Domestic Violence
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Victims
Budgets
Counties
Domestic Violence
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Victims