MD HB666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a nonprofit beer festival permit to be a nonprofit beer, wine, and liquor festival permit; altering the scope of authorization, fee, and various requirements to establish the nonprofit beer, wine, and liquor festival permit; repealing a certain wine festival permit and a certain liquor festival permit; altering a farmers' market off-site permit to be a retail off-site permit; and altering the scope of authorization, fee, and various requirements to establish the retail off-site permit.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival Permit - Retail Off-Site Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213492/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fairs
Fees
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales
Transient Merchants
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fairs
Fees
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales
Transient Merchants