MD HB662 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property owned or leased by a business entity affected by a state of emergency declared under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide for the amount and duration of the credit, the eligibility criteria, and the regulations and application process for the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB261 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9303(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback