MD HB661 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a food service facility that offers children's meals to offer certain beverages, plain water, whole, nonfat, or low fat unsweetened milk, a certain nondairy beverage, or a beverage consisting of 6 ounces or less of 100% fruit or vegetable juice or a combination of both, as the default beverages included with the meal.
Title
Health – Food Service Facilities – Beverage Options With Children’s Meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB263 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 21 | 330.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |