MD HB661 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; repealing Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-26HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10210.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback