MD HB661 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying in the Criminal Procedure Article a requirement in the Family Law Article that an officer arrest with or without a warrant and take into custody a person who the officer has probable cause to believe is in violation of a protective order.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Arrest - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (121-17) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Judiciary |