MD HB659 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the continued detention, beyond emergency detention, of a child under the age of 12 years unless the child is alleged to have committed a certain act that, if committed by an adult, would be a crime of violence or the child is likely to leave the jurisdiction of the court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {112113/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback