MD HB658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to include in an annual report to be submitted to certain committees of the General Assembly and the Department of Legislative Services by December 1 each year information on interagency agreements with historically black colleges and universities, including the total percentage of interagency contracts with historically black colleges and universities by agency or unit and any recommendations for regulatory or statutory changes to address certain barriers.
Title
Interagency Agreements – Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {304968/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethics
Evidence
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Minorities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Universities and Colleges
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethics
Evidence
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Minorities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Universities and Colleges