MD HB656 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer a maintenance injectable medication to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures for approving classes of maintenance injectable medications and requiring pharmacists to complete a certain training program in order to administer a maintenance injectable medication; etc.
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
(The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {106780/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB545 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Examinations
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Examinations
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 148 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |