MD HB651 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB370
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to develop certain rules and regulations for the certification of educational interpreters on or before July 1, 2022; providing that individuals who are deaf or hard of hearing may not be denied the right to receive certain credentials or a contract for work for which the individual is otherwise qualified; requiring the State Board and the Board to consider including a full or partial reimbursement of certain costs for certificate candidates; etc.
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295263/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB651 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB464 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
SB464 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Blind Persons
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Language
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 704.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |