MD HB650 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to order a specified defendant's doctor to develop a treatment plan within 5 days of the defendant's admission to a designated facility after a finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible under specified circumstances; providing that if a defendant refuses medication, the court may order a clinical review panel to convene within 14 days of the defendant's admission to the designated facility in order to review any proposed administration of psychiatric medication over the refusal of the defendant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Evaluation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2017-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {922919/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback