MD HB65 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1484

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing provisions creating the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists Fund; and requiring the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists to pay money collected for its services into the General Fund of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (126-0)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-01-11HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1484 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB516 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations21101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations21206(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback