MD HB648 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing annual and special meetings of the members of an electric cooperative to be conducted in person, virtually, or both; requiring the members of the cooperative, by majority vote, to determine in the cooperative's bylaws how meetings may be held; requiring the notice of annual and special meetings to include certain information; altering certain requirements for a quorum; authorizing voting to be conducted in a certain manner in accordance with the cooperative's bylaws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Cooperatives – Meetings – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273
2021-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-09SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2021-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {283791/1 Adopted
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB561 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations5616(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5617(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5618(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations5619(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback