MD HB646 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the frequency, from at least once every 5 years to on or before October 1 each year, at which the Maryland Health Care Commission is required to adopt a State health plan; requiring the State health plan to be consistent with the Maryland All Payer Model Contract; requiring the Commission to annually or on petition review each State health plan chapter for potential revision and establish at a public meeting a priority order and timeline of the State health plan chapter review and revision; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - State Health Plan and Certificate of Need for Hospital Capital Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {696082/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Communications
Contracts
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Public Information
Publications
Time
Zoning and Planning
Communications
Contracts
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Public Information
Publications
Time
Zoning and Planning