MD HB645 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB306
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the making or causing to be made a false statement, report, or complaint that a person knows to be false, in whole or in part, to a law enforcement officer of the State, of a county, municipal corporation, or other political subdivision of the State, or of the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Police about a person or group with the intent to deceive and to cause investigation or other action may form the basis for a certain hate crime.
Title
Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-30) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513527/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB306 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB151 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
SB151 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |