MD HB645 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to certain members under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of a special disability retirement allowance; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {994065/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | Recommitted to Appropriations (Delegate McIntosh) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Accidents
Collective Bargaining
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Public Employees
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Collective Bargaining
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Public Employees
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation