MD HB645 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to certain members under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of a special disability retirement allowance; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {994065/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-15HouseRecommitted to Appropriations (Delegate McIntosh)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback