MD HB644 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax equal to 50% of the renovation costs incurred during the taxable year to provide accessibility and visitability features to an existing home; providing that the credit may not exceed $5,000; requiring applicants to file a specified application and an amended return; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the credit which may not exceed $1,000,000 in a calendar year; etc.
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {635861/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Corporations
Disabilities
Home Improvement
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Disabilities
Home Improvement
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income