MD HB643 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; repealing the authority for special appointment positions; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications at the Department would be described as being skilled service or professional service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-8) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-14) (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (37-8)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (121-14)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {154565/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback