MD HB642 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Anne Arundel County; specifying the individuals who are qualified to hold the license include the holder of a certain barbershop permit or a certain beauty salon permit; authorizing the holder of a license to serve not more than 5 ounces of beer or wine to a customer for on-premises consumption; specifying the hours during which a license holder is authorized to serve beer and wine; stating that a license holder need not obtain a certain Sunday license; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-29HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB361 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages111002(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages11102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback