MD HB641 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, as funds are available, to conduct a needs assessment, initiate a statewide public awareness campaign, solicit funding, and review and recommend initiatives related to the hepatitis B virus; requiring the Department, as funds are available, to coordinate with the Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to develop specified hepatitis B virus and hepatitis C virus plans; etc.
Title
Hepatitis B and Hepatitis C Viruses - Public Awareness, Treatment, and Outreach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 224138/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 586888/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Immunization
Minorities
Public Information
Reports
Sunset
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Immunization
Minorities
Public Information
Reports
Sunset