MD HB64 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a requirement for designating a beneficiary of a member, former member, or retiree of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing an option for a member, former member, or retiree to designate a beneficiary through the State Retirement Agency's secure access participant portal with an electronic signature; altering the definition of "designated beneficiary"; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback