MD HB639 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB14
Note: Carry Foward to future SB36
Note: Carry Foward to future SB36
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the court to decree a limited divorce; and altering certain grounds for an absolute divorce.
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-7) |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB639 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB639 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB639 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Adultery
Court Orders
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Residency
Court Orders
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Divorce
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 7 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |