MD HB638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date of the evaluation provision relating to the State Board of Physicians under the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) from 2021 to 2019; requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a performance audit of the State Board of Physicians to evaluate whether the board is operating in an economic, efficient, and effective manner; requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Physicians - Sunset Evaluation and Performance Audit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {486388/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback