MD HB638 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified work release and prerelease programs in Montgomery County from specified prohibitions relating to telecommunication devices in a place of confinement.
Title
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs MC 21-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-16) (Y: 118 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-16) (Y: 118 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-16) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Montgomery County
Prisoners
Public Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Montgomery County
Prisoners
Public Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones