MD HB637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a title insurer to conduct a required annual review of a title insurance producer in person, remotely by using mail, overnight delivery, or electronic means, or by a combination of in-person and remote methods.
Title
Insurance – Title Insurance Producers – Annual Review
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993929/1 Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Communications
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Postal Service
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles
Communications
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Postal Service
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles