MD HB635 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing penalties from 3 years to 5 years imprisonment for the crime of homicide by motor vehicle or vessel while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance.
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] |
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Michael Malone [R] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Homicide
Penalties and Sentences
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Homicide
Penalties and Sentences