MD HB634 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to study emerging communications technologies and develop a strategy for implementation of Next Generation 9-1-1 services across the State; authorizing the Emergency Number Systems Board to contract with a third-party contractor to provide staff for the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816389/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Fees
Frederick County
Grants
Procurement
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Fees
Frederick County
Grants
Procurement
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology