MD HB634 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the circumstances under which a licensed physician assistant may perform non-fluoroscopic X-ray procedures using a mini C-arm or similar low-level radiation machine; and requiring a primary supervising physician to obtain specified approval from the Board of Physicians.
Title
Physician Assistants - Performance of X-ray Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 606986/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Equipment
Health Occupations
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Radiation
Education
Equipment
Health Occupations
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Radiation