MD HB633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funds for reasonable costs and attorney's fees for students provided counsel under certain provisions of law; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Fund; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Fund; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-3) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-18) (Y: 120 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-18) (Y: 120 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-18) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {264336/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-14) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {794660/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Budgets
Civil Actions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Court Costs
Courts
Education
Ethics
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Treasurers
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Budgets
Civil Actions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Court Costs
Courts
Education
Ethics
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Treasurers