MD HB633 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enabling private entities to accept the use of a certain substitute address by a victim of domestic abuse who is a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring any person to accept a certain address of a participant in an address confidentiality program as the address of the participant; prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally seeking and obtaining the actual address or telephone number of a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring the Secretary of State to adopt regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71) (Y: 67 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFloor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71)
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {670012/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0633&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0633f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0633t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_423_hb0633t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0633_11332402.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0633_67001201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0633.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0633_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0216.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0260.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0633_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1013.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback