MD HB632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the removal and impoundment of certain unlicensed junk motor vehicles and parts in Carroll County under certain circumstances; and repealing a certain prohibition and fine.
Title
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Motor Vehicles
Search and Seizure
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Motor Vehicles
Search and Seizure
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous