MD HB631 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the membership of the Park Advisory Commission in the Department of Natural Resources from 9 to 12 members.
Title
Natural Resources - Park Advisory Commission - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |