MD HB630 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each school district to adopt or update a school district energy policy beginning July 1, 2022; specifying the contents of a school district energy policy; encouraging school districts to set targets to increase the school district's use of renewable energy and reduce the school district's greenhouse gas emissions; requiring that a school district energy policy be posted on the school district's website and updated every 3 years; requiring the development of a certain standardized reporting template for school districts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
2021-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-11SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (99-40)
2021-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {774167/1 Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-26HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2021-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5312.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback