MD HB629 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain date to January 1, 2020, by which the State is required to discontinue a certain prescription drug benefit for certain retirees; authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a certain dependent to elect to have the dependent covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to provide a certain notice to certain retirees of certain changes not later than July 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback