MD HB626 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the use of certain vehicle height monitoring systems in Prince George's County to enforce certain State and local laws during certain times; requiring the establishment of a workgroup of county and municipal officials to examine certain matters before the installation of any vehicle height monitoring systems in Prince George's County; requiring the establishment of a workgroup to include trucking industry representatives for certain purposes prior to the installation of certain vehicle height monitoring systems; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-23SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (122-11)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {880617/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-17HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings7302(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation24111.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback