MD HB626 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an animal shelter to follow a specified written protocol for reclaiming animals; requiring the Department of Agriculture, on or before January 1, 2018, to adopt specified minimum standards of care for dogs and cats in animal shelters; requiring an animal shelter to follow the minimum standards of care adopted by the Department; and requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-5) (Y: 130 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409
2017-03-31HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (130-5)
2017-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {730116/1 Report Adopted
2017-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0626&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0626f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0626t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_409_hb0626t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0626_73011601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0626.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0626_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0626_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0626,h-0234&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0626,s-0965&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback