MD HB625 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain requirement regarding the confidentiality of certain proceedings, testimony, and other evidence; prohibiting members and staff of the Commission to Restore Trust in Policing from being required to sign a confidentiality agreement to receive documents or files, altering, from 2019 to 2020, the due date for a report that the Commission is required to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requesting the Governor to appropriate sufficient funds to allow the Commission to complete its work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {662816/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback