MD HB622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB994
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting consumer reporting agencies from including in a consumer report certain records relating to a criminal proceeding involving a consumer; and prohibiting consumer reporting agencies from relying on information in certain criminal proceedings concerning the consumer to make a determination of the creditworthiness of a consumer.
Title
Consumer Reporting Agencies - Records of Criminal Proceedings - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-8) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-24) |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB994 (Carry Over) 2023-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Expungement
Records
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Expungement
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 1203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |