MD HB622 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Hershey and Augustine)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Hershey and Augustine)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard to apply only to distribution sales of electric companies; altering the manner in which an electric company may reflect and recover offshore wind renewable energy credit costs; altering certain compliance fees for shortfalls from the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Hershey and Augustine) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-06 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {583120/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-31) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703325/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB526 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Subjects
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Wind Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Wind Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |