MD HB622 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to establish certain guidelines by December 1, 2018, for public schools regarding the administration of health care services to students with sickle cell disease; requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health by December 1, 2018, to provide technical assistance on implementation of the guidelines and to develop a process to monitor implementation of the guidelines; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {994935/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {305765/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0622&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0622f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0622t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0622e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_386_hb0622e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0622_30576501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0622_99493501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0622.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0622_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0161.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0622_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0985.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1093.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback