MD HB616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain authorization for certain Department of State Police police employees to work an alternative workday or a 40-hour civilian employee to work an alternative workday of not more than 12 hours instead of an 8-hour workday.
Title
Department of State Police - Alternative Workdays
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 274 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {104462/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB485 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 275
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |